Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann de Flekenstein, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Basel


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1423AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
30 May 1423Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
20 Dec 1436DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann de Flekenstein:
Bishop Johann de Flekenstein O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Basel

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,833
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013