Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raban von Helmstatt

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1396AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
22 May 1430AppointedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
4 Jan 1438ResignedBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 May 1439DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Raban von Helmstatt:
Archbishop Raban von Helmstatt (died ) Archbishop of Trier

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460, and Page 495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016