Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidore Fattal

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1886Born
20 Jul 191225.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 194356.6AppointedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
16 Jul 194356.7AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Aug 194356.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
4 Sep 196174.8DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Isidore Fattal
Archbishop Isidore Fattal (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cairo

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 47
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast