Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Germanos Farhat, O.L.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1670BornAlep
1696²25.1Ordained PriestPriest
1725¹54.1AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
29 Jul 172554.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
10 Jul 173261.6DiedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Germanos Farhat:
Bishop Gabriel Germanos Farhat O.L.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,584
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015