Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Esquivel

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
20 Jun 160551.4AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
11 Sep 160551.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
21 Dec 1624¹70.9DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Esquivel
Archbishop Francisco Esquivel (born 1554, died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitoria

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,497
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 120, Number 764
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018