Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iacobus (Yacoub) Eliani (Haliani)

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1802BornRasceja
20 Jun 182422.4Ordained BishopBishop
Jun 1829³27.4Converted
14 Mar 183735.2AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
10 Jul 187674.5DiedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iacobus (Yacoub) Eliani (Haliani)
Archbishop Iacobus (Yacoub) Eliani (Haliani) (born 1802, died ) Archbishop of Damas

  • a bishop for 52.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016