Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio Giorgio Sciahin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1842¹Born
18 May 187230.3AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
19 May 187230.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
1912¹70.0ResignedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
15 Jan 192785.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Giorgio Sciahin
Archbishop Gregorio Giorgio Sciahin (born 1842, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRasciaya, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

  • a bishop for 54.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017