Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Giuseppe de Sousa Magelhaes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Mitylene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1809Born
20 Sep 183425.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 185344.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Mar 185344.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
29 May 185344.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
19 Feb 187262.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Domenico Giuseppe de Sousa Magelhaes
Archbishop Domenico Giuseppe de Sousa Magelhaes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Pouca d'Aguair

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 387
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast