Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de Santa Maria, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cochin, India


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1588AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
18 Dec 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
1615²ResignedBishop of Cochin, India
10 Nov 1618DiedBishop Emeritus of Cochin, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Santa Maria
Bishop Andrés de Santa Maria O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cochin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVypeen, ile de Cochin, Diocese of Cochin

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 171
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018