Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mateus de Medina, O. Mil. J. Chr. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1578AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
19 Feb 1588AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
29 Jul 1593DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Mateus de Medina
Archbishop Mateus de Medina O. Mil. J. Chr. (died ) Archbishop of Goa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018