Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Delfino della Pergola

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398¹Born
24 Aug 142527.6AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
18 Sep 142628.7Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
24 Sep 146365.7AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
1465²67.0DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Delfino della Pergola
Bishop Delfino della Pergola (born 1398, died 1465) Bishop of Modena

  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 197
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Oct 2016
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392
  • ob: Treccani.it, 21 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Oct 2016