Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1401AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
27 Sep 1402AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
28 Sep 1426DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Grassi:
Bishop Pietro Grassi (died ) Bishop of Pavia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 390, and Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013