Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacopo-Antonio dalla Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1439AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
16 Aug 1439Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
19 Oct 1444AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
24 Sep 1463AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
15 Jan 1476AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
1486¹DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacopo-Antonio dalla Torre:
Bishop Jacopo-Antonio dalla Torre Bishop of Cremona

  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,989
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 222, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 213, and Page 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013