Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe de la Vallée

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
22 Aug 158834.6AppointedBishop of Toul, France
19 Feb 158935.1Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
28 Apr 160753.3DiedBishop of Toul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophe de la Vallée
Bishop Christophe de la Vallée (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAubreville, Meuse
Ordained BishopBernardines, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceLiverdun, Meurthe et Moselle

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018