Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Facundo (Fernando) de la Torre, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570²BornSahagún, Spain
17 Jul 163161.5SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
2 Jan 163262.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Sep 163262.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
25 Sep 164070.7DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Facundo (Fernando) de la Torre:
Archbishop Facundo (Fernando) de la Torre O.S.B. (born 1570, died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 156, Number 990
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015