Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Diaz de Tenorio

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
13 Jan 1377AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 May 1399DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Diaz de Tenorio
Archbishop Pedro Diaz de Tenorio (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalicia o Toledo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 196
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,591
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 305, Number 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast