Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gonzalez Fernandez de Illescas

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1394AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
17 Mar 1395AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
30 Jul 1403AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
15 Nov 1415DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Gonzalez Fernandez de Illescas:
Bishop Juan Gonzalez Fernandez de Illescas (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 119, and Page 538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,593
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,991
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,158
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 306, Number 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015