Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Serrano

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1388AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
22 Dec 1389AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
24 Feb 1402DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Serrano:
Bishop Juan de Serrano (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 443, and Page 444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,592
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 306, Number 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015