Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel da Natividade, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornThomar, Portugal
15 Sep 167560.7SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
2 Dec 167560.9ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1676²61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
8 Dec 168570.9DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
18 Mar 168671.2AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Natividade:
Bishop Manuel da Natividade O.F.M. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87, and Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015