Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Théodose V (Athanase) Dahan, B.C. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateEventTitle
1736¹AppointedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
16 Jan 1736Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Jul 1764ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
9 Jul 1764ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
30 Mar 1788DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodose V (Athanase) Dahan:
Patriarch Théodose V (Athanase) Dahan B.C. (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 52.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015