Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cyril VI (Séraphim) Tanas

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornDamascus
24 Sep 172444.7Ordained BishopPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Oct 172444.8ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Oct 172444.8ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
10 Jan 176080.0DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyril VI (Séraphim) Tanas:
Patriarch Cyril VI (Séraphim) Tanas (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013