Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João d’Aguiar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1796Born
10 Feb 182225.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 185760.6SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
3 Aug 185761.2ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
1 Nov 185761.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
2 May 187174.9ResignedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
2 Feb 187578.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João d’Aguiar
Bishop João d’Aguiar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvora, Archdiocese of Évora
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018