Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Correia (Carreia) Valente, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funay (Funai), Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹Born
10 Jan 158417.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1599²32.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Jan 161851.0AppointedBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
18 Mar 161851.2Ordained BishopBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
28 Oct 163366.8DiedBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Correia (Carreia) Valente
Bishop Diego Correia (Carreia) Valente S.J. (born 1567, died ) Bishop of Funay (Funai)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceMacau, Diocese of Macau, China

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,618, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast