Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Charbicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Margarita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585²Born
17 Dec 163449.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Dec 163449.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Margarita
12 Aug 163550.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margarita
22 Jun 163853.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Charbicki
Bishop Krzysztof Charbicki (born 1585, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,635, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast