Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cantucci

Deceased

Bishop of Loreto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1586AppointedBishop of Loreto, Italy
30 Mar 1586³Ordained BishopBishop of Loreto, Italy
26 Nov 1586DiedBishop of Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cantucci (VIAF: 59897760)
Bishop Francesco Cantucci (died ) Bishop of Loreto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,673
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018