Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Burke

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmacduagh


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Nov 1732SelectedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
22 Nov 1732ConfirmedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
8 Mar 1733Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
1 Jan 1744DiedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Martin Burke:
Bishop Martin Burke (died ) Bishop of Kilmacduagh

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015