Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Boislève

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1595Born
5 Jan 165155.8SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
10 Dec 165156.7ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
3 Dec 166772.7DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Boislève
Bishop Gabriel de Boislève (born , died ) Bishop of Avranches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018