Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Heinrich Bliestle, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1896Born
7 Sep 192832.1Temporary VowsMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
8 Sep 193135.1Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
1 Apr 193336.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
29 Jul 193337.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
Jul 1959³62.9AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
12 Oct 197175.2CeasedSuperior General of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
20 Feb 198790.5DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Bliestle (VIAF: 171951315)
Father Heinrich Bliestle M.S.F. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVöhrenbach
Death PlaceWerthenstein
Buried Place (Original)Werthenstein

  • a priest for 53.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast