Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Bianco

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1753BornSassari
18 Sep 180249.2SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
23 Sep 180552.2ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
22 Dec 180552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
28 May 182773.9DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bianco:
Bishop Pietro Bianco (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,516
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013