Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Pes

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1714BornTempio
31 May 173824.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 178470.7SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
14 Feb 178571.1ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
3 Apr 178571.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1804¹90.0DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Pes:
Bishop Michele Pes (born ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806, Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80
  • ob: CB, 1 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013