Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zbynék Berka z Dubé a Liepé


Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star


1574²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
1582²31.0AppointedAdministrator of Regensburg, Germany
1587²36.0ResignedAdministrator of Regensburg, Germany
21 Jun 159342.4AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 Jun 159342.4AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
10 Oct 159342.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Mar 160655.1DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zbynék Berka z Dubé a Liepé (VIAF: 69289120)
Archbishop Zbynék Berka z Dubé a Liepé (born 1551, died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

Birth PlaceDrevenice
Ordained PriestPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, St. Vitus, Cathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 14


Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches


About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018