Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop János Kutasy

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1589AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
23 Sep 1592AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1596²AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
29 Jan 1597AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Nov 1601DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Kutasy
Archbishop János Kutasy (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 304, and Page 172
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018