Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gian Francesco Cardinal Biandrate di San Giorgio Aldobrandini

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1545Born
12 Aug 158540.3AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
3 Nov 158540.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
5 Jun 159651.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159651.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
25 Nov 159853.6ResignedBishop of Acqui, Italy
16 Apr 160358.0AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
16 Jul 160560.2DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Gian Francesco Biandrate di San Giorgio Aldobrandini (VIAF: 200029705)
Gian Francesco Cardinal Biandrate di San Giorgio Aldobrandini (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale di Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceLucca, Diocese of Lucca
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 23, Number 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018