Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Barbo

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1526AppointedBishop of Pedena, Austria
13 May 1526Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
16 Jan 1547DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Barbo
Bishop Giovanni Barbo (died ) Bishop of Pedena

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Eustache, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,526, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast