Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Vergerio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
5 May 153639.3AppointedBishop of Modruš, Croatia
6 Sep 153639.6AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
Dec 1545³48.9Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
3 Jul 154952.5ResignedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
6 Oct 156568.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Vergerio
Bishop Pietro Paolo Vergerio (born 1497, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapodistria, Diocese of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Capodistria, Diocese of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)
Death PlaceTübingen

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018