Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Banchieri

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere

Prefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1667Born
3 Oct 171245.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
1724²56.6ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
9 Dec 172659.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Apr 172860.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 172860.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
15 Jul 173063.1AppointedSecretary of State
15 Jul 173063.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
16 Sep 173366.3DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Banchieri (VIAF: 38517691)
Antonio Cardinal Banchieri (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
Death PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santissimo Nome di Gesł, Church, Pistoia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast