Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Michel Bakar, Ist. del Prado

Protosyncellus of Egypt, Sudan, and South Sudan (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium dei Greco-Melkiti

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1946 Born
6 Jul 197327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
9 Feb 200659.8AppointedProtosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
9 Feb 200659.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium dei Greco-Melkiti
9 Feb 200659.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Mar 200659.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pelusium dei Greco-Melkiti
5 Jan 200861.7ResignedProtosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
4 Jun 200862.1AppointedProtosyncellus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Georges Michel Bakar
Archbishop Georges Michel Bakar Ist. del Prado (born ) Protosyncellus of Egypt, Sudan, and South Sudan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCairo
Ordained BishopResurrection, Cathedral, Cairo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Patriarchal Dependent Territory of Egypt, Sudan, and South Sudan (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2006
  • c2/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,093
  • r: CB
  • qidp/r/ab: CB, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jul 2017