Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Joaquim de Azevedo e Moura

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1794Born
23 Sep 182025.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 184550.9SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Jan 184651.2ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
29 Mar 184651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
22 Apr 185661.5SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Jun 185661.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Nov 187682.1DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Joaquim de Azevedo e Moura (VIAF: 98869473)
Archbishop José Joaquim de Azevedo e Moura (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfándega da Fé

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 398
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast