Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Audo

Deceased

Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1855Born
1880¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189035.0AppointedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
1 May 189236.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
27 Jul 191862.7DiedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Audo (VIAF: 88464766)
Archbishop Thomas Audo (born , died ) Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlkosch
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 576
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017