Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Apelian

Deceased

Bishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1806Born
20 May 184235.8AppointedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
31 Jul 184236.0Ordained BishopBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
2 Sep 187569.0DiedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Pierre Apelian
Bishop Pierre Apelian (born , died ) Bishop of Marasc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnkara

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018