Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jacob Petros VII Holassian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1841SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
27 Jan 1842ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
6 Feb 1843DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Jacob Petros VII Holassian
Patriarch Jacob Petros VII Holassian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast