Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Antón Serra

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornZaragoza
19 Apr 162136.2AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
1 Aug 162136.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
17 Feb 163247.1DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Antón Serra:
Bishop Pedro Antón Serra (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 140, Number 891
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015