Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Bernard d’Angeloch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1586BornUberlingen
24 Aug 161023.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 161326.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
25 May 161326.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
14 Jul 161326.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
6 Apr 164659.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean Bernard d’Angeloch:
Bishop Jean Bernard d’Angeloch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015