Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Albuquerque, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Goa, India


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1537AppointedBishop of Goa, India
13 Jan 1538Ordained BishopBishop of Goa, India
28 Feb 1553DiedBishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for João de Albuquerque
Bishop João de Albuquerque O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Goa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSao Francisco, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018