Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1533AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
24 Sep 1540AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
4 Jul 1544DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas
Bishop Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas (died ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisbonne, Portugal

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 312, and Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast