Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurenz Aidinger

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1615Born
1642²26.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
15 Dec 166651.9AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
13 Mar 166752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
23 Jul 166954.5DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurenz Aidinger
Bishop Laurenz Aidinger (born , died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErding, Diocese of Freising, Germany
Ordained BishopWien, Diocese of Wien
Death PlaceWiener Neustadt, Diocese of Wiener Neustadt

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 4
  • bp/c2/dp: CB, 13 Aug 2017
  • bp/c2/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,466

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018