Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anton Agreiter, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1934Born
13 Jul 195824.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
1 Oct 198652.5AppointedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
1 Oct 198652.5AppointedSuperior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha
9 Aug 200268.3ResignedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
9 Aug 200268.3ResignedSuperior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha
15 Oct 200369.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

MicroData Summary for Anton Agreiter (VIAF: 23115327)
Father Anton Agreiter M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Andrea in Monte, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph's, College, Mill Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceBolzano, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Bolzano, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.2 years

Source(s):
  • c1/loc: CL, 13 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast