Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Alphonso Mexia de Tovar

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564¹Born
24 Nov 160440.8AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
1 Jun 161551.4AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Dec 161955.9AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
30 Aug 162359.6DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Alphonso Mexia de Tovar
Bishop Martin Alphonso Mexia de Tovar (born 1564, died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Major

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast