Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Abra de Raconis

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹Born
17 Jun 163645.4SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
10 Jan 163948.0ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
16 Jul 164655.5DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Abra de Raconis:
Bishop Charles-François Abra de Raconis (died ) Bishop of Lavaur

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015