Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Apostolicus Vicariatus Insularum S. Petri et Miquelonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 16 November 1970
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Saint Pierre and Miquelon
  • Square Kilometers: 245 (94 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Vicariat Apostolique, B.P. 4245, F-97500 Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
  • Telephone: 5.08.41.02.40
  • Fax: 5.08.41.47.09

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
1763ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon (erected)
13 June 1818ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon (erected)
4 March 1912ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
16 November 1970ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
19635,2285,24899.6%66871183ap1967
Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
19675,2605,28599.5%3586575172ap1971
19765,8605,91099.2%1569766153ap1977
19806,2506,33298.7%441,5624143ap1981
19906,1556,20099.3%1341,5383103ap1991
19976,2156,25599.4%223,107273ap2000
20006,3106,31699.9%223,155272ap2001
20016,3126,32699.8%223,156272ap2002
20026,3096,32199.8%223,154272ap2003
20036,3146,33099.7%223,157262ap2004
20046,3006,32599.6%223,150262ap2005
20105,9896,02099.5%222,994272ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 31 May 2013